Case Information: 40928 | |||
Short Caption: | GILMORE (NICHOLAS) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR022048 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/12/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/12/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 03-02483 | |
02/18/2003 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 03-02660 | |
03/25/2003 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: March 31, 2003. | 03-05009 | |
03/27/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 03-05170 | |
03/27/2003 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Joint Appendix. | 03-05171 | |
04/16/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 03-06480 | |
05/08/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP03-RR/WM/MG | 03-07811 | |
06/03/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-07907 | |
06/03/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/25/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 4, 2003. | 03-07907 |