judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LARRY EDWARDS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0564
Short Caption:LARRY EDWARDS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11022-86Filed Date:05/19/1987

Opening Event Date:05/19/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/16/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/21/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/18/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/25/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLarry Edwards N
M. Azhar KhanYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas J. Kelly YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901EDWARDS, LARRY UNITED STATES
05/19/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/13/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD R
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) M. AGHAR KHAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 063087 SCHPRD CHECK
07/31/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
10/16/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/16/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (42 PGS - BREMEN) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/16/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(66 PGS. -- HUNT) RJG PANEL SCDATE 083187 SCHPRD RT
10/22/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/4/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD BA
12/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3( 265 PGS. -- CARTER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/17/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/31/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/31/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEB 18TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 020188 SCHPRD BE
12/31/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BA; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 121487 SCHPRD OPE
01/29/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/18/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 011988 SCHPRD N
02/18/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 21ST (NO OPA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 021888 SCHPRD BE
02/25/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/21/88; ANXF. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 022488 SCHPRD X
03/21/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/21/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 032188 SCHPRD BE
07/18/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/18/1988SUBMITTED PANELMKRGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELMKRGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
08/25/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD