judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EDWARD L. WALDROP V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0558
Short Caption:EDWARD L. WALDROP V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3829-86Filed Date:05/26/1987

Opening Event Date:05/26/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/27/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/01/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEdward L. Waldrop N
Gary T. BrownNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WALDROP, EDWARD L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 100787 ORD: REMANDING CASE TO NOTE - 01 TRIAL CRT FOR DETERIMINATION NOTE - 02 OF PENDING MO FOR RECONS; CLEK NOTE - 02 OF SUPR CRT TO TRANSMIT RULING NOTE - 03 PROMPTLY THEREAFTER TO THIS NOTE - 03 CRT AS A SUPP RECORD.
05/26/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GARY T. BROWN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 062687 SCHPRD CHECK
07/10/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 071087 SCHPRD DSA
07/24/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD R
07/27/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/27/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/28/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: FAILURE TO FILE A COMPLETED DSA. EBP PANELBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/03/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO AUGUST 28TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 090787 SCHPRD STATE
09/03/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 090787 SCHPRD BA
09/29/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1987RECEIVED LTR FROM TRIAL JUDGE REQUESTNG REMAND. ACG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03 ACG PANELPY SCDATE 091487 SCHPRD OPE
11/02/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(TRIAL JUDGE'S RULING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION) RJG PANEL SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD SR
06/02/1988ORDER CT RPTR TO FILE 6/8/87 RT BY 7/31/88 -ABSOLUTELY-NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: RT ORD?, OR ALTERNATIVELY, APLT BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 111387 SCHPRD CHECK
10/06/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 6/8/87 RT FROM CT RPTR MITCHELL. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE BR OR VACATE APPOINTMENT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD BA
11/18/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO NOVEMBER 8TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO ADVISE CRT IN 10 DAYS OF APLT'S ITENTION OF PURSING APPEAL. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 112388 SCHPRD Q
12/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD ANSA
01/10/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
01/10/1989ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED. PB PANELRO SCDATE 010489 SCHPRD V
01/10/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
02/01/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD