Case Information: 40935 | |||
Short Caption: | RUNDLE (WILLIAM) VS. DIST. CT. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 41439 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C189563 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Certiorari/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/13/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/13/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings in District Court. (Filed via fax.) | 03-02553 | |
02/13/2003 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (Filed via fax.) | 03-02555 | |
02/14/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Order Temporarily Staying Trial. Petitioner William J. Rundle has filed an emergency motion seeking a stay of proceedings in the district court. Cause appearing, the motion is granted in part. The proceedings below are hereby temporarily stayed pending this court's receipt of the State's opposition to the motion, and this court's further consideration of the matter. | 03-02619 | |
02/18/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings in District Court. (Original--filed via fax on 2/13/03.) | 03-02648 | |
02/18/2003 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (Original--filed via fax on 2/13/03.) | 03-02649 | |
02/18/2003 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -- Receipt of Copy of Petition for Writ of Prohibition/Mandamus. | 03-02650 | |
02/27/2003 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings in District Court. | 03-03308 | |
03/03/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion Requesting Permission to File a Reply in Support of Rundle's Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings in District Court. | 03-03376 | |
03/05/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. fn1[Petitioner has also submitted a reply in support of his emergency motion and a motion requesting permission to file the reply. We grant the motion and direct the clerk of this court to file the reply received on March 3, 2003.] "We deny the petition." We also deny the emergency motion and lift the temmporary stay previously entered. NNP03-RR/WM/MG | 03-03662 | |
03/05/2003 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response. Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings in District Court. | 03-03378 | |
04/01/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 03-03730 | |
04/01/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |