judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID C. BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0575
Short Caption:DAVID C. BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7183-86Filed Date:05/04/1987

Opening Event Date:05/04/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/08/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/15/1989
Argued/Submitted:07/19/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/22/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid C. Brown N
Suzanne D. Sager YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Su Zann Lamb YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROWN, DAVID C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 072288 ORDER: GRANT CT RPTR'S NOTE - 01 REQ FOR EXT TO FILE RT OF NOTE - 02 2/2 & 2/3/86 TRIAL PROC TO NOTE - 02 9/1/88 - ABSO-NFX; CLK OF SUP NOTE - 03 CT TO TRANSMIT TO THIS CT THE NOTE - 03 RT OF THE 1/30/86 TRIAL PROC NOTE - 04 AS A SUP RECORD FORTHWITH. NOTE - 04
05/04/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/29/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 063087 SCHPRD CHECK
07/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PM PANEL SCDATE 070387 SCHPRD R
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) SUZANNE D. SAGER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/03/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (10 PGS - FINNERIN) JB PANEL SCDATE 101987 SCHPRD RT
07/22/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 060188 SCHPRD RT
09/08/1988FiledRecord Completed
09/08/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(291 PGS/SHELTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 090188 SCHPRD RT
10/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/28/88 (NO OPE) GT PB PANEL SCDATE 101888 SCHPRD BA
11/28/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD BA
12/19/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 2ND (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD BE
12/30/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO EXTENT BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 122988 SCHPRD CHECK
01/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 1ST JB PANEL SCDATE 013189 SCHPRD BE
02/24/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 3/1/89. ANY FUR REQ W/BE DISFAVORED BY THE CT. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD V
03/01/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 15, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 030189 SCHPRD BE
03/14/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 3/15/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD CHECK
03/15/1989FiledBriefing Completed
03/15/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 031589 SCHPRD BE
07/19/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/19/1989SUBMITTED PANELMKSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING THE JUDGMENT ON APPEAL SL PANELMKSTSC SCDATE 071989 SCHPRD RDEC
08/31/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
09/22/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD