Case Information: 40934 | |||
Short Caption: | LAWSON, JR. (DONALD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 38211 , 43982 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - CR0030 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/13/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/13/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 03-02531 | |
02/13/2003 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: December 10, 2002. Court Reporter: Joan Wilder. Filed in district court on: February 11, 2003. | 03-02532 | |
02/28/2003 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: December 10, 2002. Court Reporter: Joan Wilder. | 03-03338 | |
03/24/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 03-04949 | |
03/24/2003 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 03-04950 | |
04/11/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 03-06098 | |
04/11/2003 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 03-06099 | |
09/04/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP04S-NB/MS/MG | 03-14866 | |
09/30/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-14891 | |
09/30/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/09/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 1, 2003. | 03-14891 |