judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GREGORY L. JACKSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0580
Short Caption:GREGORY L. JACKSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3309-86Filed Date:05/05/1987

Opening Event Date:05/05/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/13/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/19/1988
Argued/Submitted:11/22/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/21/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGregory L. Jackson N
Anthony L. Stewart NN
AppellantGregory L. Jackson N
Anita Isicson YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Mary Ellen Abrecht YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JACKSON, GREGORY L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 12/1/87 ORD: GRANT MO TO W/D NOTE - 01 & APPT OF ANTHONY L. STEWART NOTE - 02 VACATED; ANITA ISICSON APPTD NOTE - 02 TO REPRESENT APLT; NEW COUNSEL NOTE - 03 FOR APLT TO FL STATE IN 20 NOTE - 03 DAYS INDICATING STATUS OF RT NOTE - 04 REHEARING EN BANC MLR NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 1/31/89 ORD: DENY APLT'S NOTE - 05 REQUEST FOR APPTMT OF COUNSEL. NOTE - 06 SEE WISE V. U.S., 522 A.2D NOTE - 06 898 (D.C. 1987). FO THAT APLT NOTE - 07 MAY FILE A PET FOR REH/REH EB NOTE - 07 W/I 30 DAYS.
01/01/1906 STEWARTA VACATED 12/1/87.
05/05/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 070687 SCHPRD R
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ANTHONY L. STEWART, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 063087 SCHPRD CHECK
08/03/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
11/17/1987RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, RE COURT APPOINTED COUNSEL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ANITA ISICSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 090287 SCHPRD RT
12/01/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 111887 SCHPRD DDW
12/09/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE STATUS OF TRANSCRIPTS MLH PANEL SCDATE 121287 SCHPRD STATE
12/16/1987ORDER APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 120987 SCHPRD CHECK
01/13/1988FiledRecord Completed
01/13/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (95 PGS - MOORE) JB PANEL SCDATE 020188 SCHPRD RT
02/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 21, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 022288 SCHPRD BA
03/01/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (75 PGS. -- RHOADES) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 032188 SCHPRD BA
04/22/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 6TH (NO OPPO) JB (PB) PANEL SCDATE 042288 SCHPRD BE
05/06/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/20/88 (NO OPA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 050688 SCHPRD BE
05/11/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 5/20/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 050988 SCHPRD V
05/19/1988FiledBriefing Completed
05/19/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 052088 SCHPRD BE
11/22/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/22/1988SUBMITTED PANELBESCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF CONVICTION ON APPEAL PANELBESCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/21/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 12/20/88, FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT, PRO SE, TO AP- POINT COUNSEL TO FILE A PETI- TION FOR REHEARING (NOTE 4) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 5 THRU 7 SL PANELRO SCDATE 012789 SCHPRD CHECK
03/01/1989RECEIVED ASSORTED PAPERS FROM APPELLANT PRO SE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1989RECEIVED CORRESPONDENCE FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, FORWARDED FROM U.S.D.C. MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD