judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE, DEP'T OF CONSERVATION VS. FOLEY

Case Information: 40940
Short Caption:STATE, DEP'T OF CONSERVATION VS. FOLEYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A458143Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/28/2003 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/10/2005 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:01/10/2005How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/14/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/14/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-02617
02/27/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-03302
02/28/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/28/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. Janet Trost. (docketing statement)
05/19/2003Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 10, 2003 at 10:00 a.m. 03-08419
06/13/2003Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: July 15, 2003. 03-09902
07/22/2003Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 4, 2003 at 4:00 p.m. 03-12316
09/25/2003Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 1, 2003. 03-16055
10/06/2003Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 10, 2003. 03-16606
11/17/2003Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 03-19108
11/24/2003Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 03-19559
12/09/2003Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 03-20500
12/16/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Representation of Appellant. Jill E. Drake, Deputy A.G. in place of Michel L. Wolz, Deputy A.G. 03-20934
03/23/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-05474
03/23/2004AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 04-05475
04/30/2004MotionFiled Stipulation. 04-07938
04/30/2004Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. The clerk shall file the answering brief received on April 29, 2004. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a reply brief, if deemed necessary. 04-07966
04/30/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. 04-07910
06/01/2004BriefFiled Reply Brief. 04-09940
11/17/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 10, 2005, at 2:00 p.m. (SNP05-RR/MG/JH)
12/20/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Representation of Appellant. Deputy Attorney General Michael L. Wolz in place of Deputy Attorney General Jill E. Drake. 04-23132
12/23/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/04/2005MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Continue Hearing set for January 10, 2005. 05-00155
01/04/2005MotionFiled Response to Motion. Statement of Non-Opposition to Motion to Continue Hearing Set for January 10, 2005. 05-00179
01/07/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondents have moved to continue the oral argument in this matter scheduled for January 10, 2005, at the hour of 2 p.m. Appellants have filed a statement of non-opposition to the motion. No good cause appearing, we deny the motion to continue oral argument. 05-00430
01/10/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP05-RR/MG/JH
04/14/2005Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed." Before Rose, Gibbons and Hardesty, J. Author: Hardesty, J. By the Court, Hardesty, J. We concur: Rose and Gibbons, JJ. 121 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 8. SNP05 05-07282
05/10/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-07737
05/10/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/16/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 12, 2005. 05-07737