judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DWIGHT D. HUDSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0581
Short Caption:DWIGHT D. HUDSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8296-86Filed Date:05/08/1987

Opening Event Date:05/08/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/20/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/13/1988
Argued/Submitted:01/12/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/08/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDwight D. Hudson N
Calvin Steinmetz YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Su Zann Lamb YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HUDSON, DWIGHT D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 4/15/88 ORD: DENY MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 FOR STAY W/OUT PREJ TO RENEW NOTE - 02 W/SIMULTANEOUS FLNG OF MO FOR NOTE - 02 NEW TRL OR MO TO VACATE SENTNC NOTE - 03 IN TRL CRT; BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 03 IN 30 DAYS.
05/08/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CALVIN STEINMETZ, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 062687 SCHPRD CHECK
07/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 070787 SCHPRD R
07/15/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 071087 SCHPRD DSA
07/17/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS JB PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD CHECK
08/06/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/20/1988FiledRecord Completed
01/20/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (259 PGS. -- SIMMS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GREG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (98 PGS TR - WATKINS) GREG PANEL SCDATE 090187 SCHPRD RT
03/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/5/88 GT (PB) PANEL SCDATE 030788 SCHPRD BA
03/21/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY OF APPEAL PENDING MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OR TO VACATE SEN- TENCE MLH PANEL SCDATE 040588 SCHPRD BA
04/15/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 041488 SCHPRD Q
05/13/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 051688 SCHPRD BA
06/08/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7/14/88 (NO OPA) MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 061788 SCHPRD BE
07/13/1988FiledBriefing Completed
07/13/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 071488 SCHPRD BE
01/12/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/12/1989SUBMITTED PANELRGMKKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF CONVICTION ON APPEAL PANELRGMKKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/08/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD