judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PAUL R. HARRIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0578
Short Caption:PAUL R. HARRIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7857-86Filed Date:05/07/1987

Opening Event Date:05/07/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/17/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/25/1987
Argued/Submitted:04/07/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/03/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPaul R. Harris N
Warren GormanYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Charles E. Ambrose YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HARRIS, PAUL R. UNITED STATES
05/07/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 070687 SCHPRD R
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WARREN E. GORMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 063087 SCHPRD CHECK
07/24/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
08/12/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (287 PGS. - SCHOCH) PM PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD RT
08/17/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/17/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 30 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD BA
09/22/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (9 PGS - KACZOROWSKI) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR, CLK TO FILE LDGD APLT BR; APLE BR DUE IN 30 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 091487 SCHPRD OPE
10/26/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/25/87 PB PANEL SCDATE 110587 SCHPRD BE
11/25/1987FiledBriefing Completed
11/25/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 112587 SCHPRD BE
04/07/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/07/1988SUBMITTED PANELFERGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELFERGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/03/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD