judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAMS (DANNY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34778
Short Caption:WILLIAMS (DANNY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42670 , 54202 , 69185 , 69185-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR990636Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/08/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/07/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/07/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08356
09/14/1999Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on 09/10/99 appointing the Public Defender's Office as counsel for appellant. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel). 99-08680
09/16/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Certified copy of notice of appeal filed in the district court on 09/13/99 by counsel for appellant. 99-08764
09/20/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to be relieved as counsel on appeal and motion, pursuant to NRAP 2, for suspension of filing deadlines pending this court's ruling on the motion. 99-08874
11/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. Order Clarifying Counsel of Record and Establishing Briefing Schedule. The provisions of NRAP 3C do not govern this appeal. On September 20, 1999, the Public Defender filed a motion to be relieved as counsel for the appeal. This court grants the Public Defender's motion to be relieved of counsel for this appeal. Appellant's trial counsel, John E. Oakes, Esq., is counsel of record because he filed a notice of appeal on appellant's behalf on September 13, 1999. fn1[The clerk shall amend the docket to reflect that attorney Oakes is appellant's counsel of record]. Attorney Oakes shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a docketing statement and either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall thereafter proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). fn2[The Public Defender's motion for suspension of filing deadlines is hereby denied as moot]. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 99-11567
11/19/1999MotionFiled Motion. Supplemental Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel on Appeal and Second Motion, Pursuant to NRAP 2, for Filing Deadlines Pending this Court's Ruling on the Supplemental Motion. 99-11582
12/28/1999Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement. 99-13289
01/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We direct the clerk of this court to file the untimely docketing statement submitted on December 28, 1999. We caution counsel that the other deadlines set forth in our order of November 19, 1999, relating to the transcript request form and briefing remain in effect. Counsel's failure to comply with that order may result in the imposition of sanctions. 00-00148
01/05/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-13289
02/29/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 25, 1999. Court Reporter: Debora L. Cecere. (Transcript filed in no. 34776.)
04/13/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellant: 10 days to file either a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request or to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed upon appellant's counsel; 15 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed upon appellant's counsel. Respondent shall, within 30 days of service of the opening brief, file and serve the answering brief. Briefing shall proceed with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-05930
08/08/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Imposing Sanctions. On November 19, 1999, we filed an order granting the September 20, 1999, motion of the Public Defender to withdraw as appellant's counsel of record for this appeal. On November 19, 1999, the Public Defender filed a supplemental motion. Because this motion was resolved by our order which was issued on the same day the motion was filed, we deny as moot the Public Defender's motion of November 19, 1999. The November 19, 1999, order further noted that appellant's trial counsel, John E. Oakes, is counsel of record in this appeal. To date, attorney Oakes has failed to comply with this court's orders of November 19, 1999, and April 13, 2000, or to otherwise communicate with this court. We conclude that the imposition of sanctions is warranted. Attorney Oakes shall personally pay the sum of $200 to the Supreme Court Law Library and shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file proof of such payment with the clerk of this court. Appellant shall, within the same time period, comply with NRAP 9(a) and file and serve appellant's opening brief and appendix. Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of additional sanctions, including, but not limited to, referral to the State Bar of Nevada for investigation. 00-13708
08/10/2000MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 34776/34777/34778. Doc. No. 00-13900
08/10/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order Imposing Sanctions. Nos. 34776/34777/34778. Doc. No. 00-13901
08/30/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 30, 2000, we entered an order granting appellant's motion to consolidate the appeals in Docket Number 34776 and Docket Number 34777. On August 8, 2000, we entered an order in Docket No. 34778 imposing sanctions on counsel for appellant, attorney John E. Oakes. On August 10, 2000, appellant filed a response to the order imposing sanctions. We vacate that portion of our order entered on August 8, 2000, imposing sanctions against attorney Oakes. Also on August 10, 2000, appellant filed a motion to consolidate the appeal in Docket Number 34778 with the previously consolidated appeals in Docket Numbers 34776 and 34777. No good cause appearing, we deny the motion to consolidate the appeal in Docket Number 34778 with the consolidated appeals in Docket Numbers 34776 and 34777. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix for the appeal in Docket Number 34778 within 30 days from the date of this order. Nos. 34776, 34777, 34778. Document No. 00-15229.
09/13/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Clarification. Nos. 34776/34777/34778. Doc. No. 00-16132
11/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to comply with NRAP 9(a) and to file and serve an opening brief and appendix. If appellant does not wish to continue to prosecute this appeal, then appellant should file a motion to voluntarily dismiss this appeal. 00-20493
12/11/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Request for Extension of Time in which to file Appeal. 00-21630
03/12/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We infer that attorney Oakes intended to request an extension of time to comply with NRAP 9 and to file and serve the opening brief and appendix on December 11, 2000. Attorney Oakes shall have 10 days from the date of this order to comply with NRAP 9, and 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time will be granted in the absence of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 01-04429
03/22/2001MotionFiled Motion. Karla Butko is substituted in place and stead of John E. Oakes (not signed by appellant Danny Lee Williams). 01-05103
03/22/2001MotionFiled Motion. Request for Briefing Schedule. 01-05104
08/02/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We approve the substitution of attorneys. The clerk shall modify the docket to reflect that appellant is represented by Karla K. Butko. Further, the clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on July 31, 2001. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with the schedule set forth in NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-13076
08/02/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: hand delivered 7/31/01-Reno/Carson Messenger. 01-12951
08/02/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 01-12953
08/17/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Suspend Briefing Schedule. 01-14027
08/17/2001MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Portions of the Opening Brief and Appendix. 01-14028
08/28/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of Appellant's Appendix and Portions of Fast Track Statement. 01-14548
09/04/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 1, 2001. 01-14880
10/02/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-16571
05/13/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On August 17, 2001, respondent filed a motion to strike the opening brief and appendix. On August 28, 2001, appellant filed an opposition. We note that in the absence of the parties agreeing on a joint appendix, parties may file separate appendices to their briefs. We deny the motion to strike portions of the opening brief and appendix. Additionally, we deny as moot the August 17, 2001, motion to suspend the briefing schedule pending our resolution of the motion to strike. We grant the motion filed on October 2, 2001. Respondent shall file and serve the answering brief within 20 days from the date of this order. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Finally, as it appears that all necessary transcripts have either been filed with this court or are such that they can be included in an appendix, we waive the requirement of appellant to file a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts will be requested. 02-08315
05/31/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on May 30, 2002. 02-09521
06/28/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on Reno/Carson Msgr. 6/28/02. 02-11202
06/28/2002AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. 02-11203
08/08/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-13600
08/08/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/28/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-14855
09/24/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-15122
09/24/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/30/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 27, 2002. 02-15122