judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WALTER B. SMITH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0881
Short Caption:WALTER B. SMITH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD7250-10Filed Date:07/15/2010

Opening Event Date:07/15/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/01/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/25/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWalter B. Smith YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/15/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/28/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Aaron Price, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
07/28/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Aaron Price, Esquire
07/30/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
09/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (89pgs/Tape) 7/12/10 proc. w/CD included
09/01/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JJ) For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
09/09/2010RECORD INDEX
09/09/2010RECORD COPIES
09/22/2010COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS Granted
10/13/2010ORD GRT COUNSEL MO TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASON and Aaron Price, Esquire, is hereby vacated, and Chantal Jean-Baptiste, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant herein. Aaron Price, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to newly-appointed counsel forthwith. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: ETW)
12/07/2010 On consideration of this court's order of October 13, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (By: JAC)
12/07/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (no oppo)
12/07/2010RECEIVED - aplt's brief
12/07/2010RECEIVED - appdx (attached to brief)
12/20/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
12/20/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix
01/21/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
01/25/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appellant's brief/appendix
03/31/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE*****
03/31/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal be and hereby IS AFFIRMED. (RDKRTE) (kt)
04/25/2011MANDATE ISSUED
04/29/2011CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER