judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SINATRA V. SUTTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0567
Short Caption:SINATRA V. SUTTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8984-86Filed Date:05/15/1987

Opening Event Date:05/15/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/02/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/20/1988
Argued/Submitted:05/19/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/23/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSinatra V. Sutton N
Richard A. SeligmanYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SUTTON, SINATRA V. UNITED STATES
05/15/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD SELIGMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 063087 SCHPRD CHECK
07/10/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 071487 SCHPRD R
07/13/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS LATE (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 071087 SCHPRD DSA
07/13/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/23/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/23/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR LV TO FILE DSA, CLK TO FILE LDGD DSA; APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFT RT.EBP PANELPY SCDATE 072387 SCHPRD CHECK
09/01/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (425 PGS - RAMOS) JB PANEL SCDATE 082387 SCHPRD RT
09/02/1987FiledRecord Completed
09/02/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/14/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 101287 SCHPRD BA
10/14/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BRF OF APLT BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS.DAS PANELPY SCDATE 102687 SCHPRD CHECK
11/23/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 22ND (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 112387 SCHPRD BE
12/01/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 12/22/87; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 120387 SCHPRD CHECK
12/22/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JAN. 20TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 122287 SCHPRD BE
12/31/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/20/88; NFX DAS PANELPY SCDATE 010588 SCHPRD CHECK
01/20/1988FiledBriefing Completed
01/20/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 012088 SCHPRD BE
05/19/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/19/1988SUBMITTED PANELBETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELBETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/23/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD