Case Information: 40930 | |||
Short Caption: | ZIKO VS. GORTE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A454951 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/20/2003 / Buehler, Brice | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/13/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
02/13/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 03-02517 | |
02/13/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | ||
02/13/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | ||
02/20/2003 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Brice Buehler. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/04/2003 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from David Lee Phillip & Associates - check no. 0057. | ||
03/11/2003 | Other | Other. Returned, unfiled, Case Appeal Statement. (Must be filed in district court.) | ||
03/13/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 03-04262 | |
03/13/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy filed in district court on: March 12, 2003. | 03-04277 | |
03/17/2003 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. (Motion for extension of time to file docketing statement). | 03-04431 | |
03/18/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Brice Buehler. (Case Appeal Statement) | ||
03/18/2003 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed March 13, 2003. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on March 10, 2003. | 03-04547 | |
03/18/2003 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 03-04045 | |
03/19/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Brice Buehler. (docketing statement) | ||
04/23/2003 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 03-06924 | |
05/06/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 03-07666 | |
05/06/2003 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |