judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NATHANIEL BAILEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0559
Short Caption:NATHANIEL BAILEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5668-86Filed Date:05/21/1987

Opening Event Date:05/21/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/25/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/26/1989
Argued/Submitted:10/12/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/03/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNathaniel Bailey N
Melvin M. Dildine YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Celillianne Green YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BAILEY, NATHANIEL UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 072788 ORDER: DENY CT RPTR'S NOTE - 01 REQ FOR EXT TO 12/10/88 TO NOTE - 02 FILE RT OF 2/4-2/10/87 PROC, NOTE - 02 CT RPTR TO COMPLETE & FILE RT NOTE - 03 BY 11/1/88-ANFX (WATKINS); FO: NOTE - 03 CT RPTR (JANIFER) TO COMPLETE NOTE - 04 & FILE RT OF 5/14 & 5/21/87 PR NOTE - 04 W/IN 30 DAYS ANFX.
05/21/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MELVIN M. DILDINE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 063087 SCHPRD CHECK
07/21/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD R
07/29/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
07/30/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/04/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 090887 SCHPRD BA
09/18/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 081787 SCHPRD OPE
12/18/1987RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, RE COURT APPOINTED ATTORNEY MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1988LETTER TO APLT RE HIS 12/18/88 LTR. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/27/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 031188 SCHPRD RT
09/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(48 PGS/JANIFER) AD PANEL SCDATE 082688 SCHPRD RT
10/25/1988FiledRecord Completed
10/25/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/25/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(617 PGS/WATKINS) AD PANEL SCDATE 110188 SCHPRD RT
11/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 3RD (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 120588 SCHPRD BA
12/21/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 1/3/89. PB PANELRO SCDATE 120688 SCHPRD V
01/04/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD BA
01/13/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 3RD JB PANEL SCDATE 020689 SCHPRD BE
02/08/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/3/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 020789 SCHPRD X
02/24/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/3/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 030389 SCHPRD BE
04/06/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/26/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE & BRF OF APLE IS FL; SCHED CASE FOR CONSID AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 041889 SCHPRD OPA
10/12/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/12/1989SUBMITTED PANELTESCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELTESCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/03/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD