judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RAYMOND M. NEWMAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0560
Short Caption:RAYMOND M. NEWMAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F421-86Filed Date:05/21/1987

Opening Event Date:05/21/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/11/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/10/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRaymond M. Newman N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901NEWMAN, RAYMOND M. UNITED STATES
05/21/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/04/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1987STATEMENT FROM APPELLANT RE TRANSCRIPT ORDERED MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/02/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (30 PGS. - ALLISON) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PM PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD R
08/27/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (566 PGS - SWAGERTY) JB PANEL SCDATE 090187 SCHPRD RT
03/01/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (63 PGS. -- PAVLISH) RJG PANEL SCDATE 022588 SCHPRD RT
03/09/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (22 PGS. -- TREMEL) RJG PANEL SCDATE 030188 SCHPRD RT
07/27/1988ORDER GRANT CT RPTR REQ FOR EXT TO FILE 1/23/87 RT TO 9/10/88 - ANFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 032588 SCHPRD RT
08/29/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (28 PGS WATKINS) AD PANEL SCDATE 091088 SCHPRD RT
04/11/1989FiledRecord Completed
04/11/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7(156 PGS/WHALEN) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 15, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 051690 SCHPRD BA
05/31/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRIEF TO 06/15/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 051890 SCHPRD B
06/08/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 061590 SCHPRD BA
06/18/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
06/18/1990ORDER GRT APLT'S MO AND THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED. JJ PANELJWR SCDATE 061190 SCHPRD B
06/18/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
07/10/1990MANDATE ISSUED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD