judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES T. STEWART V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1350
Short Caption:JAMES T. STEWART V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6359-87Filed Date:11/14/1989

Opening Event Date:11/14/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/17/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/15/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/26/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/05/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames T. Stewart N
Robert J. Dowlut YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Ralph J. Caccia YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901STEWART, JAMES T. UNITED STATES
11/14/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/30/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROBERT J. DOWLUT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (25 PGS/FINNERIN) AD MRTC PANEL SCDATE 011590 SCHPRD R
12/07/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 121189 SCHPRD DSA
12/12/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED ASM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/12/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(21 PGS/TANNER) AD PANEL SCDATE 010590 SCHPRD RT
01/08/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS PANEL SCDATE 012290 SCHPRD BA
03/22/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE BR, BRIEF DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 012690 SCHPRD U
07/17/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (49 PGS.--JANIFER) PR PANEL SCDATE 042690 SCHPRD RT
07/17/1990RECORD COMPLETED
07/19/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/22/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 082890 SCHPRD BA
09/21/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 26, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 092790 SCHPRD BE
09/26/1990RECEIVED APLE BRIEF JT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (82 PGS. -- MILLER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (37 PGS. -- SHELTON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/15/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 101290 SCHPRD V
10/15/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/15/1990BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/26/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/26/1991SUBMITTED PANELSTSCMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1991AFFIRMED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/05/1991AFFIRMED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1993LETTER to appellant in response to his letter of 12/28/92. (JAC)
03/22/1993RECEIVED - ltr from aplt requesting new counsel
04/12/1993VOTE SHEET - aplt's pro se motion to recall mandate
04/21/1993ORDER - On consideration of correspondence from appellant pro se dated January 17, 1993, and March 18, 1993, and construing such correspondence as a motion to recall mandate, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion to recall mandate is denied. STSCMK