Case Information: 44824 | |||
Short Caption: | SMITH'S FOOD & DRUG CENTERS VS. BIGGEST LITTLE INVESTMENTS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0400909 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Hardesty | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/16/2005 / Olsen, Philip | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/08/2005 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Hardesty. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
03/08/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Snell & Wilmer, LLP--check no. 3687. | ||
03/08/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 05-04582 | |
03/16/2005 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Philip A. Olsen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/23/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 05-05706 | |
03/29/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 05-06077 | |
03/31/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata. Errata to Docketing Statement. | 05-06293 | |
04/01/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Resolving Motion or Stipulation. Respondent has filed a motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. We deny respondent's motion. This denial is without prejudice to respondent's right to renew the motion, if necessary, upon completion of settlement proceedings. | 05-06424 | |
04/07/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. | 05-06893 | |
04/11/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. of Respondent's Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | 05-07062 | |
04/27/2005 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 05-08328 | |
05/10/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. | 05-09138 | |
05/17/2005 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulated Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to NRAP 42(b). | 05-09629 | |
05/26/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). fn1[Any relief regarding the bond for costs on appeal must be sought in the district court.] NNP/CLK | 05-10371 | |
05/26/2005 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |