judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TERRANCE D. SPIVER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1348
Short Caption:TERRANCE D. SPIVER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3880-88Filed Date:11/13/1989

Opening Event Date:11/13/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/11/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/02/1990
Argued/Submitted:03/20/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/26/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTerrance D. Spiver N
Betty J. Clark YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Philip S. Kushner YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901OLIVER, TERRANCE D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/03/20 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - CLARKB FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - KUSHNERP FOR - APPELLEE
11/13/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/30/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BETTY J. CLARK, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) RJG PANEL SCDATE 011290 SCHPRD R
02/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(167 PGS/MILLER) AD PANEL SCDATE 032390 SCHPRD RT
03/07/1990ORDER APLT TO FL DSA IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 121189 SCHPRD DSA
03/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(6 PGS/MOORE) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 031990 SCHPRD DSA
04/04/1990RECEIVED SUPPLEMENT TO DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990ORDER APLT, BY 4/16 TO SHOW CAUSE WY CASE SHD NOT BE DISMSD AS UN- TIMELY. (VACATED 7/11/90) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/16/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1990FiledRecord Completed
07/11/1990ORDER VACATING THIS CT'S 4/6/90 ORD; BRIEF OF APPELLANT DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. CWC PANELNWFETE SCDATE 061290 SCHPRD VS
09/04/1990ORDER COUNS FOR APLT TO FL BRF W/IN 10 DAYS. FAILURE MAY RESULT IN APPOINTMENT BEING VACATED. GW PANELRO SCDATE 082490 SCHPRD V
09/05/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO AMEND BA SCHED TO PERMIT BA TO BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 9/28/90 RJG PANEL SCDATE 091490 SCHPRD BA
09/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/17/1990RECEIVED BRIEF OF APLT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(6 PGS/MOORE) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/03/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/03/1990ORDER GRT APLT MOS TO AMEND BRF SCHE & FOR LV TO FL LODGED BRF; APLE BRF DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 100190 SCHPRD B
10/18/1990RECEIVED MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1990FiledBriefing Completed
11/02/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 110290 SCHPRD BE
11/29/1990RECEIVED COPY OF ORDER W/ATTACHMENTS FROM JUDGE BURGESS FOR APPEAL UNDER SEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (ORDER OF JUDGE BURGESS DATED 10/3/90) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1991ORDER GRANT APLT'S REQUEST TO PRE- SENT ORAL ARGUMENT ON 3/20 AT 1:30 PM. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 030191 SCHPRD VS
03/20/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/20/1991ARGUED PANELTESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELTESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/26/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD