Case Information: 44814 | |||
Short Caption: | KATZMAN VS. DIST. CT. (GARDOCKI) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 35191 , 36936 , 37899 , 42660 , 43279 , 43864 , 47018 , 48494 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A398514 Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A454553 Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A430287 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/04/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Laxalt & Nomura - check no. 27176. | ||
03/04/2005 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 05-04356 | |
06/09/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. | 05-11412 | |
07/13/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Real Parties in Interest's Motion for Extension of Time to file Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 05-13938 | |
07/19/2005 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed July 13, 2005. The real parties in interest shall have until August 11, 2005, to file and serve their answer. | 05-14331 | |
08/15/2005 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. | 05-16085 | |
10/21/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. for Writ of Mandamus. "We deny the petition." NNP06R-MD/RR/RP | 05-20865 | |
11/16/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 05-21716 | |
11/16/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |