judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MELVIN B. CHERRY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0652
Short Caption:MELVIN B. CHERRY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Lead:87-CF-0652Consolidated: 87-CF-0719
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8346-86Filed Date:06/04/1987

Opening Event Date:06/04/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/30/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/18/1988
Argued/Submitted:05/04/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/30/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMelvin B. Cherry N
Thomas G. Ross YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Joan Ann Barton YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CHERRY, MELVIN B. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: MARYL. RAWLS/AKA MARY NOTE - 01 L. CHERRY NOTE - 02 050288 ORDER: GRANT APLE REQ NOTE - 02 TO CONS 87-652 & 87-719, FO: NOTE - 03 CT RPTR TO FILE RT OF 4/1/87 NOTE - 03 W/IN 20 DAYS-NFX; FO: APLT BR NOTE - 04 BR IN 87-719 DUE W/IN 40 DAYS NOTE - 04 AFT RT IS FILED; & CON BR OF NOTE - 05 APLE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 CON 87-719 NOTE - 06
06/04/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS G. ROSS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/30/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/30/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PM PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD R
08/10/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS TIME HAVING EXPIRED JB PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
08/10/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (128 PGS - SWARINGER) PB PANEL SCDATE 073087 SCHPRD RT
09/11/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/15/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/15/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (176 PGS - SANBORN) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 1ST JB PANEL SCDATE 102187 SCHPRD BA
12/03/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DEC. 30TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD BA
01/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/11/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 21ST JB PANEL SCDATE 011888 SCHPRD OPE
01/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 1ST JB PANEL SCDATE 012588 SCHPRD OPE
02/02/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/11/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 22ND JB PANEL SCDATE 022388 SCHPRD OPE
02/23/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 29, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/10/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF (MXBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF ACG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO'S TO EXT TM TO FL BRF, FL LODGED BRF & APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. ACG PANELPY SCDATE 022588 SCHPRD X
05/02/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 05. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 042188 SCHPRD BE
05/02/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (21 PGS - TREMEL) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1988ORDER APLT BR IN 87-719 DUE W/IN 40 DAYS, CONS BR OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 052388 SCHPRD RT
07/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/21/88 (NO OPE) IN #87-719 GT PB PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD BA
08/22/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 87-719 JB PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD BA
09/15/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 21, 1988 RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 092188 SCHPRD BE
10/20/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 28, 1988 RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 102188 SCHPRD BE
10/26/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1988FiledBriefing Completed
11/18/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 111788 SCHPRD V
05/04/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/04/1989SUBMITTED PANELFESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/30/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD