Case Information: 44813 | |||
Short Caption: | JENNINGS (CHARLES) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 31863 , 38044 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C140821 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/23/2005 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/04/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/04/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 05-04355 | |
03/21/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of the record on appeal due: 60 days. fn2[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings). | 05-05444 | |
03/31/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copies of: (1) Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order signed on 3/16/05 and filed in district court on 3/24/05; and (2) (1) Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order signed on 3/23/05 and filed in district court on 3/24/05. | 05-06323 | |
05/23/2005 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 15. | 05-10086 | |
05/23/2005 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/23/2005 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Robin J. Mills, Clark County Deputy Clerk. On January 14, 1998, a Reporter's Transcript was filed entitled "Trial Testimony of Charles Jennings" for December 4, 1997. The district court is unable to locate this transcript. However, the trial transcript of the complete proceedings for December 4, 1997, including the testimony of Charles Jennings was filed on March 26, 1998 and is included as part of the record. | 05-10087 | |
01/27/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Supplemental record (transcripts held on May 27, 2004 and February 25, 2005) due: 35 days. | 06-02061 | |
02/14/2006 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 5/27/04. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. | 06-03225 | |
02/14/2006 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 5/27/04. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. | 06-03236 | |
02/27/2006 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 02/25/05. Court Reporter: Joseph D'Amato. | 06-04260 | |
02/27/2006 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 2/25/05. Court Reporter: Joseph D'Amato. | 06-04500 | |
04/19/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH | 06-08180 | |
05/16/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-08287 | |
05/16/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/05/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 22, 2006. | 06-08287 |