Case Information: 40947 | |||
Short Caption: | LOOMIS VS. LANGE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 42334 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9706719 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/27/2003 / Berry, Robert | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/18/2003 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from William Patterson Cashill--check no. 8825. | ||
02/18/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 03-02680 | |
02/27/2003 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert G. Berry. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/07/2003 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 03-03868 | |
03/11/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Robert G. Berry. (docketing statement) | ||
03/14/2003 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Docketing Statement. | 03-04358 | |
03/31/2003 | Other | Other. Filed Reply to Respondents's Response to Docketing Statement. | 03-05341 | |
04/23/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. Removed Republic Financial Corporation and Winestock Corporation as respondents. | ||
06/09/2003 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Notice of Appeal, Docketing Statement, and Case Appeal Statement. | 03-09583 | |
07/22/2003 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. David J. Guinan, Esq. substituted as attorney for appellants in the place and stead of William Patterson Cashill, Esq. | 03-12356 | |
07/22/2003 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 03-12357 | |
07/22/2003 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 03-12358 | |
07/30/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK | 03-12800 | |
07/30/2003 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |