judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROLAND J. WHITE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0624
Short Caption:ROLAND J. WHITE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10534-86Filed Date:05/27/1987

Opening Event Date:05/27/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/14/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/26/1989
Argued/Submitted:10/24/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/16/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRoland J. White N
Jensen E. Barber YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WHITE, ROLAND J. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 FE: APPEAL FROM ORDER DENYING NOTE - 01 MOTION TO SUPRESS
05/27/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JENSEN E. BARBER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 071387 SCHPRD CHECK
07/24/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD R
07/28/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
08/19/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (5 PGS. - SALAZAR) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/19/1988ORDER CT RPTR TO FILE 5/4/87 RT BY 8/30/88 - ABSOLUTELY - NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1988FiledRecord Completed
09/14/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(103 PGS/MOORE) AD PANEL SCDATE 083088 SCHPRD RT
10/24/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 23RD (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 102488 SCHPRD BA
11/21/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 23RD (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 112388 SCHPRD BA
12/07/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 12/23/88. PB PANELRO SCDATE 112388 SCHPRD V
12/20/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 23RD (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 122388 SCHPRD BA
12/30/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/23/89; NFX. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 123088 SCHPRD CHECK
01/23/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 012389 SCHPRD BA
02/27/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 27, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 022789 SCHPRD BE
03/01/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/27/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 030989 SCHPRD CHECK
03/27/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-26-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 032789 SCHPRD BE
03/31/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 4/26/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 040689 SCHPRD CHECK
04/26/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/26/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 042689 SCHPRD BE
10/24/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/24/1989SUBMITTED RJG PANELRGTERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/25/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANELRGTERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/25/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/16/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD