judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHITE PINE LUMBER VS. WASHOE COUNTY

Case Information: 34758
Short Caption:WHITE PINE LUMBER VS. WASHOE COUNTYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9903534Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/03/1999 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/01/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robison Belaustegui Robb & Sharp--check no. 047254.
09/01/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08195
09/01/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: July 22-23, 1999. To Court Reporter: Judy Schonlau. 99-08224
09/03/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/23/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 22, 1999, 1:30 p.m. and July 23, 1999, 9:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Judith Ann Schonlau. Mailed on 09/22/99. 99-09074
09/24/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-09154
09/24/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-09155
10/29/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NNP/CLK 99-10592
10/29/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.