judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FRAN GILLETT v. MICHAEL WHITE and PAMELA WHITE

Case Heading (06-144)
Case Number:06-144Case Docketed On:06/23/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:FRAN GILLETT v. MICHAEL WHITE and PAMELA WHITE
Full Title:FRAN GILLETT, Appellant (Defendant), v. MICHAEL WHITE and PAMELA WHITE, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFran GillettTony S. Lopez
AppelleeMichael WhiteMason F. Skiles
AppelleePamela WhiteMason F. Skiles

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 44
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/23/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/23/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/23/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/23/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/04/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/19/2006Event - Phone Call to counsel for appellee; received the original and two copies of brief. Requested additional copies - will mail immediatelyEventPhone CallFinal
09/20/2006Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
10/05/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/05/2006Brief - Appellant reply - missing from Clerk's fileBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/09/2006Event - Phone Call to counsel for appellant, received faxed copy of designation of record, told him to file with clerk of the district courtEventPhone CallFinal
10/12/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, Original PapersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/12/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
10/12/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/13/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal orderOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/30/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal