judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LAND (FREDERICK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34757
Short Caption:LAND (FREDERICK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 47666
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C67553Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/27/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/01/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/01/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08194
09/22/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of ROA due: 120 days. ROA must include any previously prepared transcripts; ROA shall not include exhibits. 99-09022
10/25/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: October 19, 1999. 99-10410
12/27/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 6. Mailed on 12/21/99. 99-13147
12/27/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/06/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. fn8-[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-11424
07/31/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-11600
07/31/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 20, 2001. 01-11600