judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DOUGLAS MORRISON, CHARLES W. SMITH, and RONALD HANSEN, in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Newell B. Sargent 1990 Living Trust v. FORREST L. CLAY and F. KELLY CLAY

Case Heading (06-21)
Case Number:06-21Case Docketed On:01/31/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Trusts (Title 4)
Short Title:DOUGLAS MORRISON, CHARLES W. SMITH, and RONALD HANSEN, in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Newell B. Sargent 1990 Living Trust v. FORREST L. CLAY and F. KELLY CLAY
Full Title:DOUGLAS MORRISON, CHARLES W. SMITH, and RONALD HANSEN, in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Newell B. Sargent 1990 Living Trust, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. FORREST L. CLAY and F. KELLY CLAY, Appellees (Defendants/Counterclaimants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDouglas MorrisonJudith A. W. Studer
Rick L. Koehmstedt
AppellantCharles W. SmithJudith A. W. Studer
Rick L. Koehmstedt
AppellantRonald HansenJudith A. W. Studer
Rick L. Koehmstedt
AppelleeForrest L. ClayPatrick J. Murphy
AppelleeF. Kelly ClayPatrick J. Murphy

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2006 WY 161
Citation:149 P.3d 696

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/31/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/31/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/31/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/31/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/07/2006Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
03/16/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/16/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/21/2006Order - Consolidating cases. Order granting motion to consolidiate appeals. Case 06-21 consolidated with 05-281. (Briefing in this docket number is vacated.)OrderConsolidating casesFinal
03/24/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/30/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, eighteen volumes: Volumes I-XIV, original papers; Volume XV, transcripts; Volumes XVI-XVIII, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/14/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/04/2006Order - Assignment of judge. Filed order recusing Justice Kite and assigning Kenneth Stebner, District Judge, retired, to act in this matter.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
05/08/2006Order - Oral argument - amending schedule. Filed order rescheduling setting for oral argument.OrderOral argument - amending scheduleFinal
05/24/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Hill, Justices Golden, Voigt, and Burke, and Stebner, DJ Retired (Judith Studer for appellants; Patrick J. Murphy for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/24/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/28/2006Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing 05-281 and affirming No. 06-21. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/30/2007Order - Grant. Order awarding attorneys' fees and costs.OrderGrantFinal
01/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/30/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/30/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/31/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cards (4)ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal