Case Information: 44770 | |||
Short Caption: | BOGDANOVICH VS. SHALLENBERGER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 37065 , 39774 , 44056 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 00CV0252 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Gibbons | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/28/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Jeffrey K. Rahbeck--check no. 8241. | ||
02/28/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 05-03891 | |
02/28/2005 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Gibbons. | ||
03/10/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 05-04834 | |
03/16/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 05-05179 | |
06/28/2005 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 28, 2005. | 05-12744 | |
07/25/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondent may file any reply within 10 days form the date that appellants' response is served. | 05-14651 | |
08/24/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | 05-16762 | |
09/20/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. On August 24, 2005, appellant filed a notice of withdrawal of their appeal, which we elect to treat as a motion for voluntary dismissal. We grant the motion and " . . . dismiss this appeal." The parties shall bear their own fees and costs, if any. NNP06R-MD/RR/RP | 05-18633 | |
09/20/2005 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |