judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN G. HARPER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0555
Short Caption:JOHN G. HARPER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:87-CF-0555Consolidated: 87-CF-0796
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6764-86Filed Date:05/21/1987

Opening Event Date:05/21/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/25/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/28/1988
Argued/Submitted:12/06/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/09/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn G. Harper N
Mindy A. DanielsYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Edith S. Marshall YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HARPER, JOHN G. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: VERA E. HARDIN NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 3/14/88 ORD: GRANT MO TO REIN- NOTE - 02 STATE 87-796; SS, CON 87-555 & NOTE - 03 87-796 & CLK TO FL BRF OF APLT NOTE - 03 IN 87-796; CONS BRF OF APLE NOTE - 04 DUE IN 30 DAYS. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 CON 87-796 NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 4/19/88 ORD: GRT MO OF APLT NOTE - 06 FOR LV TO FILE SUPPL BRF AND NOTE - 07 MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FILE NOTE - 07 BRF. CLK DIRTD TO FILE LODGED NOTE - 08 SUPPL BRF OF APLT IN NO. NOTE - 08 87-555. APLE'S BRF SHALL BE NOTE - 09 FILED ON OR BEF 4/28/88. NOTE - 09
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/12/06 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - DANIELSM FOR - APLT HARPER ATTY 2 - ROBERTSONJ FOR - APLT HARDIN ATTY 3 - MARSHALLE FOR - APPELLEE
05/21/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MINDY A. DANIELS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 062687 SCHPRD CHECK
07/21/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD R
07/31/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
08/25/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/25/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/25/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (486 PGS - SCHOCH) PB PANEL SCDATE 083187 SCHPRD RT
09/30/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 13TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD BA
10/07/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT, BRF OF APLT DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD CHECK
11/06/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD BA
12/09/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 26, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 121187 SCHPRD BE
02/19/1988ORDER SS, BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS DAS PANELPY SCDATE 012788 SCHPRD X
03/14/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 87-796. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 030888 SCHPRD X
03/24/1988RECEIVED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF OF APPEL- LANT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1988APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRF/MEMO MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/28/88 (NO 0PA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 041488 SCHPRD BE
04/19/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 6 THRU 9 SL PANELPY SCDATE 041388 SCHPRD Q
04/19/1988APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1988FiledBriefing Completed
04/28/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 042888 SCHPRD BE
12/05/1988ORDER DENIED APLT'S MO TO POSTPONE ARG. IN 87-796. PB PANELFETESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/06/1988ARGUED PANELFETESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/15/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENTS OF CONVICTION PANELFETESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/15/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/09/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD