judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES B. MORSE, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0498
Short Caption:CHARLES B. MORSE, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:87-CF-0498Consolidated: 88-CF-0290
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8204-86Filed Date:05/07/1987

Opening Event Date:05/07/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/09/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/18/1988
Argued/Submitted:12/13/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/16/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles B. Morse, Jr.N
Robert J. Dowlut YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Patricia A. Riley YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MORSE JR., CHARLES B. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 88-290 NOTE - 01
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/12/13 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - DOWLUTR FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - RILEYPA FOR - APPELLEE
05/07/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROBERT J. DOWLUT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 061287 SCHPRD CHECK
07/09/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 070687 SCHPRD R
07/10/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 071087 SCHPRD DSA
10/01/1987RECEIVED COPY OF MOTION FILED IN SUP CT TO SECURE TRANSCRIPT FOR PUR- POSE OF THIS APPEAL. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (318 PGS - BURNS) PB PANEL SCDATE 093087 SCHPRD RT
10/15/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER THE COMPLETE TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 112487 SCHPRD BA
11/24/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 111187 SCHPRD OPE
12/07/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(71 PGS. -- BURNES) RJG PANEL SCDATE 012788 SCHPRD RT
01/19/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF & LIST & APPENDIX GREG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/10/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/18/88 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 021888 SCHPRD BE EXTDTE 031888
03/21/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/18/88 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 031888 SCHPRD BE
03/23/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FILE BRF TO 4/18/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 032388 SCHPRD V
04/01/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THIS APPEAL WITH APPEAL # 88-290 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/15/1988ORDER GRANT MO TO CONS 87-498 & 88- 290;CLK OF SUPER CRT TO TRNSMT REC IN 88-290. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 041488 SCHPRD Q
04/15/1988APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM OF APPELLANT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/18/88 (NO OPA) MLH (PB) PANEL SCDATE 041888 SCHPRD BE
05/18/1988FiledBriefing Completed
05/18/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 051888 SCHPRD BE
06/03/1988APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF TO 6/13/88 (NO OPE) MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/13/1988ARGUED PANELFEBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF TRIAL COURT JUDGMENT PANELFEBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/17/1989PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC OF APPELLANT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD