judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT A. WALKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1221
Short Caption:ROBERT A. WALKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F162-88Filed Date:10/12/1989

Opening Event Date:10/12/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/08/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/21/1991
Argued/Submitted:02/20/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/30/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert A. Walker N
Betty M. Ballester YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Nancy E. Larson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WALKER, ROBERT A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: LAMBERT SMITH, ANTHONY NOTE - 01 MATTHEWS
10/12/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/27/1989RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM RUST - 8/7/89 PROCEEDING JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BETTY M. HUNTER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1989RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM TANNER - 4/14/89 PROCEEDING JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD DSA
12/19/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 121189 SCHPRD R
12/28/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(7 PGS/FINNERIN) AD PANEL SCDATE 032489 SCHPRD RT
01/24/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD 32(79 PGS/TANNER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (11 PGS. -- HAWKINS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 032390 SCHPRD RT
05/08/1990RECORD COMPLETED
07/24/1991ORDER APLT BRF DUE W/IN 40 DYS FRM DT OF ORDER. APLE BRF DUE W/IN 30 DYS THEREAFTER. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 062891 SCHPRD U
09/05/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS - NO OPPO PMB PANEL SCDATE 090391 SCHPRD BA
09/25/1991ORDER GR MO OF APLT EXT TM FL BRF TO 10/3/91, BRF OF APLE TO BE FLD BY 11/4/91. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 091991 SCHPRD K
10/11/1991ORDER APLT TO FL BRF IN 5 OR VACATE CJA APPT. AD PANELRO SCDATE 100891 SCHPRD K
10/17/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 101891 SCHPRD BA
10/17/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF GR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1991ORDER APLT MO X TM FL LODGED BRF GRNTD. APLT BRF DUE 11/21/91. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 102991 SCHPRD OPE
11/21/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 112191 SCHPRD BE
11/21/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/20/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/20/1992SUBMITTED PANELRGSCBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1992AFFIRMED MOJ AF APPELLANT'S CONVICTION PANELRGSCBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1992DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/30/1992MANDATE ISSUED