judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GERALD H. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1236
Short Caption:GERALD H. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6284-89Filed Date:10/18/1989

Opening Event Date:10/18/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/08/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/28/1991
Argued/Submitted:01/10/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/05/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGerald H. Johnson N
Phyllis Joan Baron YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth H. DanelloYY
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOHNSON, GERALD H. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902OF APPELLANT (NFX)
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 7/11/91 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 01 BY 9/3/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 02 10/7/91; REPLY BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 02 BY 11/4/91; SCHED CASE ON JAN NOTE - 03 1992 CAL.; NFX. EVH NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 8/29/91 ORD: DENY MO OF APLT NOTE - 04 TO EXT TM & BRF OF APLT IS DUE NOTE - 05 BY 9/9/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 05 10/14/91 & REPLY BRF OF APLT, NOTE - 06 IF ANY, DUE BY 11/4/91; CASE NOTE - 06 TO REMAIN SCHED ON JAN 1992CAL NOTE - 07 3/9/92 ORD: DENY APLT'S NOTE - 07 REQUEST FOR APPTMT OF NEW NOTE - 08 COUNSEL (SEE WISE V. U.S.). NOTE - 08 FURTH ORD THAT THE MO TO EXT NOTE - 09 TM IS GRANTED AND THE PET FOR NOTE - 09 REH/REH EN BANC SHALL BE FILED NOTE - 10 W/I 30 DAYS FM DATE OF THIS NOTE - 10 ORDER. FURTH EXTS OF TIME NOTE - 11 WILL BE GRANTED ONLY UNDER NOTE - 11 EXTRAORDINARY CIRCUMSTANCES.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 92/01/10 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BARONP FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - DANELLOE FOR - APPELLEE
10/18/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/31/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JET PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD DSA
10/31/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PHYLLIS BARON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 121889 SCHPRD R
03/27/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (273-PGS/SHELTON) AJ PANEL SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD RT
04/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(99 PGS/SHELTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (18-PGS/LEWIS) AJ PANEL SCDATE 040790 SCHPRD RT
04/19/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (179 PGS. -- WHALEN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 050190 SCHPRD RT
05/08/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (145 PGS. -- WHALEN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1990RECORD COMPLETED
06/21/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY THE EXECUTION OF A PENDING APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1991LETTER OF APLT REQUESTING THE NAME OF HIS ATTORNEY & STATUS OF MOTION TO STAY PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 070891 SCHPRD V
07/19/1991LETTER REFERRING TO COUNSEL LTR FROM APLT RECVD 7/16/91 SL PANELJAC SCDATE 071191 SCHPRD CHECK
07/25/1991APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S 7/19/91 LETTER RJG PANEL SCDATE 072991 SCHPRD ANSA
08/22/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 3, 1991 RJG PANEL SCDATE 090391 SCHPRD BA
08/29/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-06. DAS PANELTE SCDATE 082691 SCHPRD T
09/09/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 090991 SCHPRD BA
09/27/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2 WKS TO 10/28/91 AJ PANEL SCDATE 101491 SCHPRD BE
10/15/1991ORDER CRT'S 8/19/91 ORD IS HEREBY VACT'D; GR MO OF APLE FR EXT BRF OF APLE DUE 10/28/91. EVH PANELRO SCDATE 100191 SCHPRD TT
10/28/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 102891 SCHPRD BE
10/28/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
11/18/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/26/1991ORDER GRT APLT MO FOR LV TO FL LODGE REPLY BRF & THE LODGED REPLY IS FILED. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 111991 SCHPRD B
11/26/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/06/1992CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/07/1992MEMORANDUM CIRCULATING CORRESPONDENCE FRM APLE PURSUANT TO RULE 28 (K) KHO PANEL SCDATE 010792 SCHPRD MEMO
01/10/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/10/1992ARGUED PANELFEFAGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1992AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEFAGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1992DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/13/1992DISMISSED
01/30/1992RECEIVED PRO SE MXRRB - RETURNED 2/3/92 PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/10/1992APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FL PETITION FOR REH/EB AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1992ORDER APLT TO FILE PETITION FOR RE- HEARING EN BANC W/I 30 DAYS. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 022092 SCHPRD CHECK
02/19/1992COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS APLT PMB PANEL SCDATE 031692 SCHPRD MRRB
03/03/1992MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC PRO SE PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1992ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 7 THRU 11 SL PANELRO SCDATE 031692 SCHPRD OPE
03/11/1992ORDER GRANT COUNSEL FOR APLT'S MOT TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL KHO PANELFEFAGA SCDATE 031192 SCHPRD O
05/21/1992ORDER DENYING APLT PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC (EB)