judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSE D. SANDOVAL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1225
Short Caption:JOSE D. SANDOVAL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead: 85-CF-0497 Consolidated:89-CF-1225
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1365-83Filed Date:10/10/1989

Opening Event Date:10/10/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/05/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/18/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/26/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/17/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJose D. Sandoval N
Marion E. BaurleyYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sherri L. Evans YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SANDOVAL, JOSE D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 11/2/89 ORD: SUA SPONTE CONSOL NOTE - 01 THIS APPEAL W/NO. 85-497 FOR NOTE - 02 ALL PURPOSES. FO THAT MARION NOTE - 02 E. BAURLEY, ESQ., IS HEREBY NOTE - 03 APPTD AS CNSL TO REPRESENT NOTE - 03 APLT ON THIS APPEAL AND THAT NOTE - 04 NEWLY-APPTD CNSL IS DIRTD TO NOTE - 04 FILE THE DKTG STMT IN NO. NOTE - 05 89-1225 W/I 10 DAYS FROM THE NOTE - 05 DATE OF THIS ORDER. NOTE - 06 CON: 85-497 NOTE - 06 NOTE - 07 06/01/90 ORD: DIRG COUNSEL FO NOTE - 07 APLT TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 10 DYS NOTE - 08 OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APTMT SHOULD NOTE - 08 NOT BE VACATED UNDER CJA.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/02/26 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BAURLEYM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - ZEIDENBERGP FOR - APPELLEE
10/10/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/02/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MARION E. BAURLEY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 5 SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD DSA
01/24/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 121189 SCHPRD R
03/05/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF NO TIME AJ PANEL SCDATE 020590 SCHPRD BA
03/28/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRF WITHIN 30 DAYS; NFX. GW PANELDDW SCDATE 032290 SCHPRD V
06/01/1990ORDER (SEE NOTE FIELDS 7 THRU 8) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/11/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 25, 1990 & ANSWER TO ORDER DATED 6/1/90 RJG PANEL SCDATE 061190 SCHPRD BA
06/27/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF (MXBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1990ORDER DIRG CLK TO FILE APLT'S BR; FO BE DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/09/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1990FiledRecord Completed
09/05/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF, BRIEF DUE W/IN 30 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 082490 SCHPRD U
09/18/1990FiledBriefing Completed
09/18/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (STIPULATION; GOVT'S EXHIB. # 4,6,7,8 & 11) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/26/1991ARGUED PANELFEWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/17/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD