judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICHARD GOLSUN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1222
Short Caption:RICHARD GOLSUN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6481-88Filed Date:10/06/1989

Opening Event Date:10/06/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/02/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/11/1991
Argued/Submitted:04/18/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/09/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRichard Golsun N
Betty M. Ballester YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Teresa A. Howie YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GOLSUN, RICHARD UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 12/3/90 ORD: HER APPOINTMENT NOTE - 01 SHOULD NOT BE VACATED & NAME NOTE - 02 REMOVED FROM PANEL AUTHORIZED NOTE - 02 TO RECEIVE CJA APPOINTMENTS.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/04/18 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - HUNTERB FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - HOWIET FOR - APPELLEE
10/06/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/31/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BETTY M. HUNTER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD DSA
11/28/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (6 PGS. -- GOAD) RJG PANEL SCDATE 120589 SCHPRD R
12/20/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL TRANSCRIPT IS COMPLETED\ AD PANEL SCDATE 010790 SCHPRD BA
01/12/1990ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 010890 SCHPRD U
01/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(6 PGS/HART) AD PANEL SCDATE 032890 SCHPRD RT
01/19/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(136 PGS/MOLLICHELLI) AD PANEL SCDATE 032790 SCHPRD RT
01/31/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(26 PGS/PIRFO) AD PANEL SCDATE 040290 SCHPRD RT
04/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (9 PGS. -- FARMER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 033090 SCHPRD RT
07/02/1990FiledRecord Completed
07/02/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(174 PGS/JANIFER) AD PANEL SCDATE 032990 SCHPRD RT
07/16/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 071290 SCHPRD CHECK
09/19/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO (?) NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 082790 SCHPRD BA
10/03/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF W/IN 30 DAYS. NFX. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 092590 SCHPRD B
12/03/1990ORDER APLT IS DIRECTED TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 10 DAYS OR SHOW CAUSE WHY (SEE NOTES 1 THUR 2) JB PANELRO SCDATE 110790 SCHPRD U
12/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10 DAYS ( NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 121390 SCHPRD BA
01/04/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/04/1991RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1991ORDER GRT APLT'S MOTS & THE LODGED BRF OF APLT IS FL; FO BRF OF APLE DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 121990 SCHPRD B
02/11/1991FiledBriefing Completed
02/11/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 021191 SCHPRD BE
04/03/1991ORDER SUA SPONTE REMOVING CASE FROM 5/14/91 REG CAL-SCHEDULED IN ERROR. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/18/1991ARGUED PANELFESCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1991AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELFESCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -FE CITE 592 A.2d 1054
06/13/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - FE PAGE # - 1707
07/09/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD