judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JABBOURI MCCLAMB V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1226
Short Caption:JABBOURI MCCLAMB V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7502-88Filed Date:09/29/1989

Opening Event Date:09/29/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/01/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJabbouri Mcclamb N
Geoffrey D. AllenNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCCLAMB, JABBOURI UNITED STATES
09/29/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/31/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GEOFFREY D. ALLEN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD DSA
01/29/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
02/05/1990ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PURSUANT TO APPELLANT'S OWN MOTION. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
02/06/1990RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1990RECEIVED SR #1 (162 PGS. -- WHALEN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 102-PGS/HUNT) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD