judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID K. PORTER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1227
Short Caption:DAVID K. PORTER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F53-89Filed Date:10/05/1989

Opening Event Date:10/05/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/19/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/31/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/21/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/18/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid K. Porter N
Thomas T. Ruffin, Jr.NY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PORTER, DAVID K. UNITED STATES
10/05/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/31/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS RUFFIN, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1989RECEIVED APLT'S DOCKET STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD DSA
01/09/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GW PANEL SCDATE 010890 SCHPRD V
01/19/1990FiledRecord Completed
01/19/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (155 PGS/KACZOROWSKI) AD PANEL SCDATE 120489 SCHPRD R
03/07/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 4, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 022890 SCHPRD BA
03/28/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/4/90; NFX. GW PANELDDW SCDATE 032290 SCHPRD V
04/10/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 040490 SCHPRD BA
04/10/1990RECEIVED OF APLT BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1990ORDER GRANT MO TO FL APLT'S BRIEF; APLE'S BRIEF DUE IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 041390 SCHPRD V
05/15/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-31-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 051790 SCHPRD BE
05/22/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO X TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 05-31-90. NFX GR PANELDDW SCDATE 051590 SCHPRD Q
05/31/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/31/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 053190 SCHPRD BE
09/21/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/21/1990SUBMITTED PANELFETEFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFETEFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/18/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD