judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM P. EBRON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1319
Short Caption:WILLIAM P. EBRON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8075-87Filed Date:11/08/1989

Opening Event Date:11/08/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/30/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/09/1991
Argued/Submitted:04/16/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/07/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam P. Ebron N
David H. ReiterYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901EBRON, WILLIAM P. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 04/23/90 ORD: NOT BE DISMISD NOTE - 01 FOR LACK OF JURIS. SEE D.C. NOTE - 02 CODE SEC. 16-1901. NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 06/04/90 ORD: ORD THAT NOTE - 03 PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR WRIT NOTE - 04 OF HABEAS CORPUS IS DISMISSED. NOTE - 04 FO THAT THE MO OF APLT COUNSEL NOTE - 05 FOR DIRECTIONS IS GRNTD TO THE NOTE - 05 EXTENT THAT IT APPEARS THAT NOTE - 06 APLT IS PRESENTLY LOCATED IN NOTE - 06 THE ZAVALA COUNTY DETENTION NOTE - 07 CENTER U.S 83 NORTH P.O. BOX NOTE - 07 100 CRYSTAL CITY TX 78839.
11/08/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/28/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID H. REITER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 120889 SCHPRD DSA
02/23/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 010890 SCHPRD R
03/29/1990MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/23/1990ORDER DIRG APLT, W/IN 20 DAYS, TO SHOW CAUSE WHY APPEAL SHOULD (SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 & 2) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/30/1990FiledRecord Completed
04/30/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(122 PGS/JACKSON) AD PANEL SCDATE 041490 SCHPRD RT
05/02/1990MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION APLT MO TO WITHDRAW PETITION OF HABEAS CORPUS AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1990APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 4-23-90 OTSC AD PANEL SCDATE 051490 SCHPRD ANSA
06/04/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELD 03 - 07. GR PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1990ORDER DIRG APLT TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 40 DAYS. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/12/1990STATEMENT OF APPELLATE COUNSEL'S RE MO FOR DIRECTIONS AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF BRIEFS AD PANEL SCDATE 082090 SCHPRD BA
10/10/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF, BRIEF DUE W/IN 40 DYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 091490 SCHPRD U
10/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (36 PGS. -- WHALEN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 102190 SCHPRD RT
12/05/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/09/1991FiledBriefing Completed
01/09/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/16/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/16/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFETEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/16/1991SUBMITTED PANELFETEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/16/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/07/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD