judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BEYSHUN D. TUCKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1304
Short Caption:BEYSHUN D. TUCKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2618-89Filed Date:11/02/1989

Opening Event Date:11/02/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/10/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBeyshun D. Tucker N
Rufus W. Mckinney, Jr.NY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TUCKER, BEYSHUN D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1906 MCKINNEYR VACATED 11/16/90
11/02/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/15/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RUFUS W. McKINNEY, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 010390 SCHPRD R
01/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (197 PGS. -- SCHOCH) RJG PANEL SCDATE 040690 SCHPRD RT
03/28/1990ORDER APPELLANT IS DIRECTED TO FILE DSA W/IN 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER JB PANELDDW SCDATE 112789 SCHPRD DSA
04/09/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/09/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD DSA
06/26/1990ORDER DIR APLT TO FILE BRF W/IN 10 DAYS OR CASE MAY BE DISMISSED. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 062190 SCHPRD V
07/06/1990COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) APPELLANT'S WITH BRIEF ATTACHED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/13/1990LETTER ANDERS LETR TO APLT RESPONSE DUE 8/13/90. FVH PANELJP SCDATE 071190 SCHPRD K
11/16/1990AFFIRMED GRANT MO OF CNSL FOR APLT TO W/D & JUDGMENT ON APPEAL IS SUM AFFIRMED. DAS PANELFESCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
12/10/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD