judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CURTIS JORDAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1192
Short Caption:CURTIS JORDAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3610-89Filed Date:10/05/1989

Opening Event Date:10/05/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/22/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/19/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCurtis Jordan N
Richard S. StolkerNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JORDAN, CURTIS AKA CURTIS CAMPBELL UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 DENIED W/OUT PREJUDICE TO NOTE - 01 APLT'S FILING A MO FOR RELEASE NOTE - 02 IN THE TRIAL COURT IN THE NOTE - 02 FIRST INSTANCE.
10/05/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD S. STOLKER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 110289 SCHPRD DSA
01/02/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (103-PGS/MOLLICHELLI; 7-PGS WILLIAMS) AJ PANEL SCDATE 120489 SCHPRD R
01/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (51-PGS/SCHERTZER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 032890 SCHPRD RT
01/22/1990FiledRecord Completed
01/22/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1990MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APLT FOR RELASE FROM PENDING APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1990APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MMS FILED AD PANEL SCDATE 031490 SCHPRD OPE
03/29/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
03/29/1990ORDER APLT'S MO FOR RELEASE FROM CUSTODY PENDING APPEAL IS SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 THRU 02 JJ PANELFETEMK SCDATE 032290 SCHPRD VS
03/29/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - D METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
04/19/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD