judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES M. HAMILTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1193
Short Caption:JAMES M. HAMILTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1563-89Filed Date:10/05/1989

Opening Event Date:10/05/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/11/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/14/1990
Argued/Submitted:10/25/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/20/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames M. Hamilton N
Leonard J. Bonner YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth A. BreseeYN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HAMILTON, JAMES M. UNITED STATES
10/05/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) LEONARD J. BONNER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 110289 SCHPRD DSA
11/11/1989FiledRecord Completed
12/27/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (5 PGS/ARTIS) AD PANEL SCDATE 120489 SCHPRD R
01/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (8 PGS. -- HART) RJG PANEL SCDATE 032890 SCHPRD RT
01/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (125-PGS/RHOADES) AJ PANEL SCDATE 040290 SCHPRD RT
01/24/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (55 PGS. -- SWARINGER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 040190 SCHPRD RT
03/01/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 10, 1990 (NO OPP) AJ PANEL SCDATE 020590 SCHPRD BA
03/09/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 4/10/90; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 030290 SCHPRD K
04/11/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 041090 SCHPRD BA
04/11/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1990ORDER GRANT MO TO FL APLT'S LODGED BRIEF; APLE'S BRIEF DUE IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 041390 SCHPRD V
05/15/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-14-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 051790 SCHPRD BE
05/22/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO X TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 061490. NFX GR PANELDDW SCDATE 051690 SCHPRD Q
06/14/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/14/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 061490 SCHPRD BE
10/25/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/25/1990SUBMITTED PANELFEFAGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEFAGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/20/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD