Case Information: 89-CF-1228 | |||
Short Caption: | ERIC C. MIDDLETON V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F10991-88 | Filed Date: | 10/05/1989 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 10/05/1989 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 04/03/1990 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 07/03/1990 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 02/13/1991 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 03/08/1991 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Eric C. Middleton | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | MIDDLETON, ERIC C. UNITED STATES | |||
10/05/1989 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
10/31/1989 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BETH GOODMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/08/1989 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD DSA | |||
02/02/1990 | RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 120489 SCHPRD R | |||
02/05/1990 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(134 PGS/SCHOCH) AD PANEL SCDATE 040190 SCHPRD RT | |||
02/22/1990 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(75 PGS/MOORE) AD PANEL SCDATE 040290 SCHPRD RT | |||
04/03/1990 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
04/03/1990 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (5-PGS/FARMER) JT PANEL SCDATE 032390 SCHPRD RT | |||
06/05/1990 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/03/1990 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
07/03/1990 | APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 070990 SCHPRD BE | |||
02/13/1991 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
02/13/1991 | SUBMITTED PANELRGSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/14/1991 | AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/14/1991 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE | |||
03/08/1991 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |