judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERIC L. WALDRON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1215
Short Caption:ERIC L. WALDRON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12754-88Filed Date:10/13/1989

Opening Event Date:10/13/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/24/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/17/1991
Argued/Submitted:05/15/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/15/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEric L. Waldron N
James W. KleinNY
Mark J. Rochon NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Edward G. BurleyNN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WALDRON, ERIC L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902SCRND/REG
10/13/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/26/1989ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS RJG PANEL SCDATE 110689 SCHPRD DSA
11/17/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT FVH PANEL SCDATE 120589 SCHPRD K
12/08/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (99 PGS/SHELTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 121289 SCHPRD R
02/07/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #(18 PGS. -- BURNS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/15/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(588 PGS/RHOADES) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF CRT RPTR JACKSON TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE 6-28-89 PROC TO APRIL 30TH JB PANEL SCDATE 041690 SCHPRD RT
04/16/1990ORDER GRANT RPTR JACKSON TO EXT TIME TO FILE 6/28/89 RT, RT DUE BY APRIL 30TH (NFX) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/20/1990ORDER GRANT RPTR JANIFER MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE 6/21/89 PROC, RT DUE BY MAY 21ST (NFX) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/09/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (212 PGS.-- JACKSON) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (394-PGS/JANIFER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1990RECORD COMPLETED
09/13/1990APPEARANCE OF MARK J. ROCHON AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1991ORDER APLT BRF DUE W/IN 40 DYS FRM DT OF ORDER. APLE BRF DUE W/IN 30 DYS THEREAFTER. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 062891 SCHPRD U
09/03/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2 WEEKS NO OPPO PMB PANEL SCDATE 090391 SCHPRD MXBA
09/13/1991ORDER APLT MO X TM FL BRF TO 9/17/91 GRNTD. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 090591 SCHPRD GR
09/16/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 1, 1991 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 091791 SCHPRD BA
09/30/1991ORDER APLT MO X TM FL BRF TO 10/1/91 GRNTD. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 092391 SCHPRD GR
10/09/1991ORDER APLT TO FL BRF IN 10 OR DISMISS AD PANELRBH SCDATE 100791 SCHPRD K
10/10/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 23, 1991 RJG PANEL SCDATE 102191 SCHPRD BA
10/25/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/25/1991RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (18 PGS. - WHALEN) (5/10/89 PROC.) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1991ORDER APLT MOS X TM & LV FL LODGED BRF GRNTD. APLE BRF DUE ON OR BEFORE 11/29/91. PANELRBH SCDATE 110691 SCHPRD OPE
11/22/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7 DAYS - NO OPPO PMB PANEL SCDATE 112991 SCHPRD BE
12/03/1991ORDER APLE MO X TM FL BRF TO 12/6/91 GRNTD. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 112619 SCHPRD GR
12/06/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/17/91 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 120691 SCHPRD BE
12/16/1991ORDER APLE MO X TM FL BRF TO 12/17/91 GRNTD. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 120991 SCHPRD GR
12/17/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 121791 SCHPRD BE
12/17/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/15/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/15/1992ARGUED RG TE ST Mark L. Rochon, Esq. for appellant; Edward G. Burley, Esq. for appellee.
09/22/1992REVERSED AND REMANDED Judgment RV judgment of conviction & RM case for a new trial (RG TE ST)
10/15/1992MANDATE ISSUED