Case Information: 44793 | |||
Short Caption: | HUBBARD VS. MCDEVITT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0205475 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/20/2005 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/03/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Second Judicial District Court--check no. 11529. | ||
03/03/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 05-04179 | |
03/08/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. CV0205475: 120 days. fn2[See NRAP 11(a)(2) (providing that the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.)] The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. | 05-04512 | |
04/20/2005 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 7. | 05-07678 | |
04/20/2005 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/29/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Appellant must file the appeal statement on or before 10/10/05. No response required unless ordered by this court. (Pilot program civil appeal statement mailed to proper person appellant.) | 05-17041 | |
09/12/2005 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 05-18027 | |
07/05/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's judgment." fn8[We deny Hubbard's request to impose sanctions. The Honorable Miriam Shearing, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment entered January 6, 2006.] NNP-SR-NB/RP/MS | 06-13769 | |
08/01/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-14778 | |
08/01/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/17/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 2, 2006. | 06-14778 |