judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KINSTON KIRK V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1231
Short Caption:KINSTON KIRK V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4785-78Filed Date:10/16/1989

Opening Event Date:10/16/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/20/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKinston Kirk NPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901KIRK, KINSTON UNITED STATES
10/16/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/26/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 121589 SCHPRD R
03/28/1990ORDER APPELLANT IS DIRECTED TO FILE DSA W/IN 20 DAYS OR THIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED JB PANELDDW SCDATE 102689 SCHPRD DSA
04/13/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 041790 SCHPRD DSA
04/16/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1990ORDER DIRG APLT TO FILE HER BRIEF W/IN 20 DAYS OR APPEAL SHALL STAND DISMISSED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
07/25/1990ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FOR APLT'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH 6/26/90 ORDER. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
08/20/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD