judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL A. JACKSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1209
Short Caption:MICHAEL A. JACKSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12304-88Filed Date:10/17/1989

Opening Event Date:10/17/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/12/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/13/1990
Argued/Submitted:03/28/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/22/1995

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael A. Jackson N
Veronice A. HoltYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Robert J. SpagnolettiNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JACKSON, MICHAEL A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 2/28/90 ORD: APPOINTING NOTE - 01 VERONICE A HOLT, ESQ. TO NOTE - 02 REPRESENT APLT HEREIN; COUNSEL NOTE - 02 FOR FILE DOCKETING STMT W/IN NOTE - 03 10 DAYS; CLK TO FILE LODGED NOTE - 03 RECORD AND SUPP RECORD; BRIEF NOTE - 04 OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 5/21/90 ORD: COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 05 TO FILE DOCKETG STMT AND BRF NOTE - 06 OF APLT IN 10 DAYS OR SHOW NOTE - 06 CAUSE WHY HER APPT SHD NOT BE NOTE - 07 VACATED AND HER NAME REMOVED NOTE - 07 FROM LIST OF CJA ATTORNEYS. NOTE - 08 6/12/90 ORD: IT APPEARING NOTE - 08 COUNSEL DID NOT COMPLY WITH NOTE - 09 5/21/90 ORD BY FILING DOCKETG NOTE - 09 STMT AND APLT'S BRIEF----- NOTE - 10 VACATING APPT OF VERONICE HOLT NOTE - 10 AS COUNSEL FOR APLT; APPOINTG NOTE - 11 STEVEN WEINBERG, ESQ. TO NOTE - 11 REPRESENT APLT HEREIN; BRIEF NOTE - 12 OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 12
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/03/28 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - HOLTV FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SPAGNOLETTIR FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 WEINBERGS VACATED 6/21/90
10/17/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/12/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO CORRECT APLT'S COUNSEL'S APPT. STATUS AND ISSUE DOCKETING STATE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1990RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL W/64 PGS. -- SALAZAR; 19 PGS. -- SALAZAR; & 13 PGS. -- GRAYBILL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1990RECEIVED SR#1(8 PGS/BOSTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) VERONICE A. HOLT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04 CWC PANELRO SCDATE 102789 SCHPRD DR
02/28/1990RECORD ON APPEAL CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (8 PGS - BOSTON - 6/16/89 PROCEEDINGS) CWC PANEL SCDATE 012490 SCHPRD OPE
03/12/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR JANIFER CERTIFICATION OF 9/22/89 PROCEEDING (CASE NOT ON CALENDAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1990RECORD COMPLETED
05/21/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05-07 CWC PANELRO SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD BA
05/29/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 053190 SCHPRD DSA
06/12/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN WEINBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 08-12 (VACATED 6/21/90) CWC PANELRO SCDATE 062890 SCHPRD CHECK
06/14/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO VACATE ORDER DATED 6/12/90 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1990ORDER VACATING 6/12 ORDER; BRF OF APLT DUE IN 20 DAYS, NFX. CWC PANELRO SCDATE 062090 SCHPRD OPE
08/24/1990ORDER APLT'S BRF DUE W/IN 5 DAYS OR COUNSEL'S APPT VACATED & MATTR REFERRED TO BPR. CWC PANELRO SCDATE 071690 SCHPRD TO
08/28/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPT. 10, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 082990 SCHPRD BA
09/04/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/10; IF BA NOT FLD, REFER MTR TO BD ON PROF RESP. PANELRO SCDATE 090490 SCHPRD OPE
09/10/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 091090 SCHPRD BA
10/09/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 10, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 101590 SCHPRD BE
10/23/1990ORDER GRNT APLE MO X TM TO FILE BRF TO 11-10-90. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 101290 SCHPRD GR
11/13/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1990BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/05/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/11/1991LETTER GRANT APLT'S RQST OF 2/5/91 TO PRESENT ORAL ARGUMENT. CT PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/28/1991ARGUED PANELFEBEWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/31/1995AFFIRMED MOJ (WA, FE, BE)
08/22/1995MANDATE ISSUED