Case Information: 44766 | |||
Short Caption: | GENERAL MOTORS CORP. VS. HERB HALLMAN CHEVROLET | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0400826 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/08/2005 / Evans, Margaret | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/28/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Walther Key Maupin Oats Cox & LeGoy--check no. 77634. | ||
02/28/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 05-03855 | |
03/01/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. (Added Herb Hallman Chevrolet as d/b/a.) Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. | ||
03/08/2005 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Margaret Springgate Evans. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/08/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. | 05-04610 | |
03/23/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | 05-05665 | |
05/03/2005 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 11, 2005. | 05-08704 | |
05/25/2005 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 05-10310 | |
06/07/2005 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 05-11147 | |
06/29/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Transcript Request. Due Date: 10 days. | ||
07/11/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/17/04. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Reporting Services. | 05-13720 | |
07/29/2005 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: December 17, 2004. Court Reporter: Cindy Lee Brown. | 05-15087 | |
08/31/2005 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 6, 2005. | 05-17212 | |
09/14/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondent may file any reply within 10 days form the date that appellant's response is served. | 05-18171 | |
09/29/2005 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. For Lack of Jurisdiction. | 05-19395 | |
10/14/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn2 [Ithe Honorable Miriam Shearing, Senior Justice, and the Honorable Deborah A. Agosti, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment entered on July 14, 2005.] NNP-SR-RP/MS/DA. | 05-20329 | |
11/08/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 05-21661 | |
11/08/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/29/2005 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 5, 2005. | 05-21661 |