judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GREGORY J. LEFTWICH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0544
Short Caption:GREGORY J. LEFTWICH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10961-86Filed Date:05/21/1987

Opening Event Date:05/21/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/04/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/28/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGregory J. Leftwich N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LEFTWICH, GREGORY J. UNITED STATES
05/21/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/16/1987RECEIVED NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT ORDERED BY APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/18/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PM PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD R
09/08/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 PAVLISH-146 PGS TB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (146 PGS - PAVLISH) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1988FiledRecord Completed
04/04/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (504 PGS - J&J) JB PANEL SCDATE 082187 SCHPRD RT
05/16/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 31ST (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 051688 SCHPRD BA
05/26/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 053188 SCHPRD BA
06/07/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
06/07/1988ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED. PB PANEL SCDATE 060188 SCHPRD V
06/07/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
06/28/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD