judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GLENN C. KINARD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0545
Short Caption:GLENN C. KINARD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5183-86Filed Date:05/20/1987

Opening Event Date:05/20/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/24/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/09/1988
Argued/Submitted:12/07/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/30/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGlenn C. Kinard N
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Julieanne Himelstein YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901KINARD, GLENN C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 112487 ORDER: CLK TO FILE REC NOTE - 01 FILED IN 87-586 (DISMISSED AS NOTE - 02 DUPLICATE OF THIS APPEAL) AS NOTE - 02 RECORD IN THIS APPEAL; FO: NOTE - 03 APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 03
05/20/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER H. MEYERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 061987 SCHPRD CHECK
07/21/1987ORDER SS DISMISS 87-586 AS DUPLICATIVE OF THIS APPEAL. ACG PANELMK SCDATE 061987 SCHPRD CHECK
07/31/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
08/05/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (71 PGS. - SWAGERTY) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (227 PGS - SALAZAR) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/24/1987FiledRecord Completed
11/24/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD R
11/24/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (SEE 11/24/87 ORDER.) EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 4TH JB PANEL SCDATE 010488 SCHPRD BA
02/16/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 4TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 020488 SCHPRD BA
03/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF LATE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FILE BRF; CLK TO FILE BRF; APLE'S BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 18, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 041888 SCHPRD BE
04/14/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR BAIL/BOND PENDING APPEAL OF APPELLANT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/20/1988APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR BOND PENDING APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 042688 SCHPRD OPE
05/10/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/9/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 051888 SCHPRD BA
05/31/1988ORDER DENY MO FOR BOND; GRANT APLE MOS' TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/9/88; NFX. ACG PANELBETE SCDATE 042588 SCHPRD OPA
06/09/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/09/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 060988 SCHPRD BE
06/09/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 2/27/87 RT FROM CT RPTR SWAGERTY. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (8 PGS - SALAZAR) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (21 PGS - SWAGERTY) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/07/1988SUBMITTED PANELFETEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFETEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/30/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD