judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEVIN A. BECKHAM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1238
Short Caption:KEVIN A. BECKHAM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6193-89Filed Date:10/20/1989

Opening Event Date:10/20/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/26/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/28/1991
Argued/Submitted:04/10/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/12/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKevin A. Beckham N
Mitchell S. Baer YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BECKHAM, KEVIN A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
10/20/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/31/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MITCHELL S. BAER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD DSA
12/27/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 121989 SCHPRD R
02/16/1990COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT CT RPTR GLEASON CERTIFICATION OF 7/28/89 PROCEEDING (CASE NOT ON CALENDAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(50 PGS/SWARINGER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1990RECORD COMPLETED
07/19/1991ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE BY 9/11/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY 10/11/91. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 050990 SCHPRD OPA
08/05/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (9 PGS. -- GRIMES) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 20, 1991 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 091191 SCHPRD BA
09/20/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT BRIEF PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF EVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1991ORDER GR MO OF APLT FR EXT OF TM TO FL BRF; LODGD BRF IS FILED; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 092491 SCHPRD V
10/28/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 102891 SCHPRD BE
10/28/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/10/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/10/1992ARGUED before JJ FA KG BE Argument by Mitchell S. Baer, Esq., counsel for appellant; and by William Landers, Esq., counsel for appellee.
05/22/1992MANDATE ISSUED
06/12/1992MANDATE ISSUED